Almanac
Elections were held the first Tuesday of October. Members of the General Assembly took office on the first Tuesday of January. State Senators had a three-year term and State Representatives had a one-year term. The Secretary of State and Attorney General were appointed by the Governor and took office on the third Tuesday of January for a five-year term. U.S. Representatives took office March 4 and have a two-year term.
The General Assembly chose the U.S. Senators, who also took office March 4, but for a six-year term. In this case, he was initially completing the existing term, the vacancy caused by the resignation of Caesar A. Rodney. However, the General Assembly failed to fill the position for nearly a year.
Public Offices | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Office | Type | Location | Began office | Ended office | notes | |
State Representative | Legislature | Dover | January 4, 1803 | January 3, 1804 | ||
State Representative | Legislature | Dover | January 3, 1804 | January 1, 1805 | ||
State Representative | Legislature | Dover | January 1, 1805 | January 7, 1806 | ||
State Representative | Legislature | Dover | January 7, 1806 | January 6, 1807 | ||
State Representative | Legislature | Dover | January 6, 1807 | January 5, 1808 | ||
State Senator | Legislature | Dover | January 5, 1808 | January 19, 1808 | resigned | |
Secretary of State | Executive | Dover | January 19, 1808 | January 16, 1810 | Delaware | |
Attorney General | Executive | Dover | January 16, 1810 | January 17, 1815 | Delaware | |
State Representative | Legislature | Dover | January 1, 1811 | January 7, 1812 | ||
State Representative | Legislature | Dover | January 5, 1813 | January 4, 1814 | ||
State Representative | Legislature | Dover | January 4, 1814 | January 3, 1815 | ||
U.S. Representative | Legislature | Washington | March 4, 1815 | March 3, 1817 | ||
State Senator | Legislature | Dover | January 3, 1821 | January 6, 1824 | ||
U.S. Senator | Legislature | Washington | January 8, 1824 | March 3, 1827 | ||
Chief Justice | Judiciary | Dover | February 8, 1828 | January 18, 1832 | Court of Common Pleas | |
Chief Justice | Judiciary | Dover | January 18, 1832 | January 9, 1837 | Superior Court | |
U.S. Senator | Legislature | Washington | January 9, 1837 | March 3, 1841 | ||
U.S. Senator | Legislature | Washington | March 4, 1841 | March 3, 1847 |
Delaware General Assembly service | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dates | Congress | Chamber | Majority | Governor | Committees | Class/District |
1803 | 27th | State House | Federalist | David Hall | Kent at-large | |
1804 | 28th | State House | Federalist | David Hall | Kent at-large | |
1805 | 29th | State House | Federalist | Nathaniel Mitchell | Kent at-large | |
1806 | 30th | State House | Federalist | Nathaniel Mitchell | Kent at-large | |
1807 | 31st | State House | Federalist | Nathaniel Mitchell | Kent at-large | |
1808 | 32nd | State Senate | Federalist | George Truitt | Kent at-large | |
1811 | 35th | State House | Federalist | Joseph Haslet | Kent at-large | |
1813 | 37th | State House | Federalist | Joseph Haslet | Kent at-large | |
1814 | 38th | State House | Federalist | Daniel Rodney | Kent at-large | |
1821 | 45th | State Senate | Federalist | John Collins | Kent at-large | |
1822 | 46th | State Senate | Federalist | John Collins Caleb Rodney |
Kent at-large | |
1823 | 47th | State Senate | Republican | Joseph Haslet Charles Thomas |
Kent at-large |
United States Congressional service | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dates | Congress | Chamber | Majority | President | Committees | Class/District |
1815–1817 | 14th | U.S. House | Republican | James Madison | 1st at-large | |
1823–1825 | 18th | U.S. Senate | Republican | James Monroe | class 1 | |
1825–1827 | 19th | U.S. Senate | National Republican | John Quincy Adams | class 1 | |
1835–1837 | 24th | U.S. Senate | Democratic | Andrew Jackson | class 2 | |
1837–1839 | 25th | U.S. Senate | Democratic | Martin Van Buren | class 2 | |
1839–1841 | 26th | U.S. Senate | Democratic | Martin Van Buren | class 2 | |
1841–1843 | 27th | U.S. Senate | Whig | William H. Harrison John Tyler |
Printing | class 2 |
1843–1845 | 28th | U.S. Senate | Whig | John Tyler | class 2 | |
1845–1847 | 29th | U.S. Senate | Democratic | James K. Polk | Revolutionary Claims | class 2 |
Election results | |||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Year | Office | Subject | Party | Votes | % | Opponent | Party | Votes | % | ||
1814 | U.S. Representative | Thomas Clayton Thomas Cooper |
Federalist | 3,964 3,960 |
30% 30% |
Willard Hall George Read, II |
Republican | 2,547 2,545 |
20% 20% |
||
1818 | U.S. Representative | Thomas Clayton Louis McLane |
Federalist | 2,902 3,098 |
25% 26% |
Willard Hall George Read, II |
Republican | 3,007 2,818 |
25% 24% |
Read more about this topic: Thomas Clayton
Famous quotes containing the word almanac:
“It is not the purpose of literature to purvey news. For news consult the Almanac de Gotha.”
—Herman Melville (18191891)