List of Representatives
Representative | Party | Years | Electoral history | Area |
---|---|---|---|---|
District created March 4, 1833 | ||||
Joseph Duncan | Jacksonian | March 4, 1833 – September 21, 1834 |
Redistricted from the At-large district Resigned to become Governor of Illinois |
Bulk of northern and western Illinois: Adams, Calhoun, Cook, Fulton, Greene, Hancock, Henry, Jo Daviess, Knox, LaSalle, Macon, McDonough, McLean, Mercer, Morgan, Peoria, Pike, Putnam, Sangamon, Schuyler, Tazewell and Warren counties (numerous additional counties were later created within this area). During this period, Abraham Lincoln was a district resident, beginning his political career as a state legislator; the district's representative from 1839 to 1843 was Lincoln's law partner, John T. Stuart. |
Vacant | September 21, 1834 – December 1, 1834 |
|||
William L. May | Jacksonian | December 1, 1834 – March 3, 1837 |
Retired | |
Democratic | March 4, 1837 – March 3, 1839 |
|||
John T. Stuart | Whig | March 4, 1839 – March 3, 1843 |
Retired | |
Orlando B. Ficklin | Democratic | March 4, 1843 – March 3, 1849 |
Shifted to the east central part of the state, taking in Christian, Clark, Clay, Coles, Crawford, Cumberland, DeWitt, Edgar, Effingham, Fayette, Jasper, Lawrence, Macon, Moultrie, Piatt, Richland and Shelby counties. | |
Timothy R. Young | Democratic | March 4, 1849 – March 3, 1851 |
||
Orlando B. Ficklin | Democratic | March 4, 1851 – March 3, 1853 |
||
Jesse O. Norton | Whig | March 4, 1853 – March 3, 1855 |
Retired | Shifted north to cover the twelve counties to the south and southwest of Cook County: Bureau, Champaign, DeWitt, Grundy, Iroquois, Kendall, LaSalle, Livingston, McLean, Putnam, Vermilion and Will counties. |
Opposition | March 4, 1855 – March 3, 1857 |
|||
Owen Lovejoy | Republican | March 4, 1857 – March 3, 1863 |
Redistricted to the 5th district | |
Elihu B. Washburne | Republican | March 4, 1863 – March 6, 1869 |
Redistricted from the 1st district Resigned to become United States Secretary of State |
Relocated to include the six counties in the northwestern corner of the state: Carroll, Jo Daviess, Lee, Ogle, Stephenson and Whiteside counties. |
Vacant | March 6, 1869 – December 6, 1869 |
|||
Horatio C. Burchard | Republican | December 6, 1869 – March 3, 1873 |
Redistricted to the 5th district | |
Charles B. Farwell | Republican | March 4, 1873 – May 6, 1876 |
Redistricted from the 1st district Lost contested election |
Relocated to include Lake County, the sixteen townships comprising the northern half of Cook County (Barrington, Cicero, Elk Grove, Evanston, Hanover, Jefferson, Lake View, Leyden, Maine, New Trier, Niles, Northfield, Palatine, Proviso, Schaumburg, Wheeling), and the north side of Chicago (the city's northern boundary east of the river was then Fullerton Avenue). During this period, the Near North Side was recovering from the devastation of the Great Chicago Fire of October 1871. |
John V. Le Moyne | Democratic | May 6, 1876 – March 3, 1877 |
Lost re-election | |
Lorenzo Brentano | Republican | March 4, 1877 – March 3, 1879 |
Lost renomination | |
Hiram Barber, Jr. | Republican | March 4, 1879 – March 3, 1881 |
Lost renomination | |
Charles B. Farwell | Republican | March 4, 1881 – March 3, 1883 |
Retired | |
George R. Davis | Republican | March 4, 1883 – March 3, 1885 |
Redistricted from the 2nd district Retired |
Parts of the west side between 12th Street (now Roosevelt Road) and the North Branch of the Chicago River, excluding a small area north of 12th Street near the river; as the city was still expanding westward, the western boundary was Western Avenue from the river to North Avenue, and Crawford Avenue (now Pulaski Road) from North to 12th. Illinois gained two additional representatives following the 1890 Census, but they were elected on an at-large basis for the 1893-1895 term before redistricting occurred, and the previous decade's districting remained in effect. |
James H. Ward | Democratic | March 4, 1885 – March 3, 1887 |
Retired | |
William E. Mason | Republican | March 4, 1887 – March 3, 1891 |
Lost re-election | |
Allan C. Durborow, Jr. | Democratic | March 4, 1891 – March 3, 1895 |
Retired | |
Lawrence E. McGann | Democratic | March 4, 1895 – December 27, 1895 |
Lost contention after the 1894 election | From the river south to 26th Street; West of the river and south of 12th Street bordered on the west by Johnson Street (now Peoria Street) from 12th to 22nd Street (now Cermak Road) and by Halsted Street from 22nd to the river; and South of the Illinois and Michigan Canal and the river as far south as 39th Street (now Pershing Road) between Western and Wentworth Avenues. In the 1896 House election, Clarence Darrow lost by 590 votes (2.5%). |
Hugh R. Belknap | Republican | December 27, 1895 – March 3, 1899 |
Lost re-election | |
George P. Foster | Democratic | March 4, 1899 – March 3, 1903 |
Redistricted to the 4th district | |
William W. Wilson | Republican | March 4, 1903 – March 3, 1913 |
Lost re-election | Began to take on its modern territory, and included the nine southernmost townships of Cook County (Bloom, Bremen, Calumet, Lemont, Orland, Palos, Rich, Thornton and Worth), as well as that part of Chicago west of State Street between 51st Street and 111th Street excepting one and a quarter square miles in the southeast corner. (Note: In 1903 the city's western limit at 111th Street was Western Avenue, and at 115th Street was Ashland Avenue; but during this period, various portions of Calumet and Worth townships were annexed by Chicago.) Illinois' districts were not redrawn until 1947, taking effect for the 1948 elections. |
George E. Gorman | Democratic | March 4, 1913 – March 3, 1915 |
Retired | |
William W. Wilson | Republican | March 4, 1915 – March 3, 1921 |
Retired | |
Elliott W. Sproul | Republican | March 4, 1921 – March 3, 1931 |
Lost re-election | |
Edward A. Kelly | Democratic | March 4, 1931 – January 3, 1943 |
Lost re-election | |
Fred E. Busbey | Republican | January 3, 1943 – January 3, 1945 |
Lost re-election | |
Edward A. Kelly | Democratic | January 3, 1945 – January 3, 1947 |
Lost re-election | |
Fred E. Busbey | Republican | January 3, 1947 – January 3, 1949 |
Lost re-election | |
Neil J. Linehan | Democratic | January 3, 1949 – January 3, 1951 |
Lost re-election | Included that part of Chicago bounded on the north by 65th Street (Cicero Avenue to Western Avenue), Marquette Road (Western to Damen), 59th Street (Damen to Wallace) and Garfield Boulevard (Wallace to the railroad between Wentworth and State Street), and bounded on the east by the railroad (Garfield to 59th), State Street (59th to 73rd Street), Indiana Avenue (73rd to 83rd Street), South Park Boulevard (later renamed King Drive, 83rd to 99th Street), Stewart Avenue (99th to 103rd Street) and Halsted (103rd to 123rd Street). The same boundaries were maintained in the redistricting after 1950. |
Fred E. Busbey | Republican | January 3, 1951 – January 3, 1955 |
Lost re-election | |
James C. Murray | Democratic | January 3, 1955 – January 3, 1957 |
Lost re-election | |
Emmet F. Byrne | Republican | January 3, 1957 – January 3, 1959 |
Lost re-election | |
William T. Murphy | Democratic | January 3, 1959 – January 3, 1963 |
Retired | |
January 3, 1963 – January 3, 1971 |
Included the village of Evergreen Park as well as that part of Chicago bounded on the north by 66th Street (Cicero to the railroad 1/2 mile east of Kedzie), Marquette (the railroad to Damen), 59th Street (Damen to Racine) and Garfield (Racine to the railroad 1/4 mile east of Halsted), and bounded on the east by the railroad (Garfield to 59th), Halsted (59th to 63rd Street), State Street (63rd to 83rd Street), Stewart (83rd to 99th Street), State Street (99th to 111th Street), Wentworth Avenue (111th to 113th Street) and Halsted (113th to 123rd Street). There was additional redistricting in Illinois which took effect for the 1967-1969 term, but the 3rd District was not altered. | |||
Morgan F. Murphy | Democratic | January 3, 1971 – January 3, 1973 |
Redistricted to the 2nd district | |
Robert P. Hanrahan | Republican | January 3, 1973 – January 3, 1975 |
Lost re-election | Shifted primarily into suburban areas to include Thornton and Calumet Townships, most of Worth Township (excepting the municipalities of Bridgeview, Chicago Ridge, Crestwood, Palos Heights and Worth), the Chicago communities of Ashburn and Mount Greenwood, those parts of West Lawn and Chicago Lawn south of 63rd Street, and those parts of Beverly and Morgan Park west of Western Avenue. |
Marty Russo | Democratic | January 3, 1975 – January 3, 1983 |
Lost renomination | |
January 3, 1983 – January 3, 1993 |
Parts of the district shifted to the west. The district now included: Bremen Township; Worth Township excepting that part between 111th Street and 135th Street west of Cicero Avenue as well as approximately 1/4 mi² of Worth north of 111th; that part of Calumet Township in Blue Island and Calumet Park northwest of the railroad running from 123rd and Laflin to the western township line; that part of Thornton Township west of the Calumet Expressway having as its northern boundary 167th Street (from the Bremen Township line to the eastern edge of Hazel Crest), 171st/172nd Street (Hazel Crest to Halsted Street), 167th (Halsted to State Street, which becomes Indiana Avenue) and the Little Calumet River (Indiana Avenue to the Calumet Expressway); the part of Stickney Township south of 65th Street; the Chicago communities of Clearing, West Lawn, Ashburn, Mount Greenwood and Beverly, the western part of Morgan Park, and the additional part of Chicago between 55th Street, 75th Street, Cicero Avenue and the railroad 1/4 mile east of Western excepting that portion from the railroad to Western between 63rd Street and 69th Street. | |||
Bill Lipinski | Democratic | January 3, 1993 – January 3, 2003 |
Redistricted from the 5th district Retired |
Shifted significantly to the northwest, and now included: all of Lyons Township; all of Stickney Township except the portion north of Pershing Road; all of Berwyn and Riverside; approximately the eastern half of Brookfield and the western half of Cicero; those portions of Forest Park and North Riverside east of the Des Plaines River and south of Harrison Street; most of Oak Park south of the Eisenhower Expressway; those parts of Worth Township having as their eastern boundary Pulaski Road from 87th Street to 101st Street, and Cicero Avenue from 101st Street to 135th Street, with minor variations in Oak Lawn; those parts of Palos Township having as their western boundary Roberts Road (80th Avenue) from 87th Street to 120th Street and then southwest along the railroad to 135th Street, plus approximately 1/8 m² west of Roberts Road in the vicinity of Stagg High School; those parts of Bremen Township having as their eastern boundary Cicero Avenue from 135th Street to 143rd Street, the railroad and then Pulaski from 143rd Street to 159th Street, Cicero from 159th Street to 167th Street, Interstate 57 from 167th Street to 177th Street, and Central Avenue from 177th Street to 183rd Street; the Chicago communities of Garfield Ridge, Clearing, Archer Heights, West Elsdon and West Lawn, those parts of Gage Park, Chicago Lawn and Ashburn west of Kedzie Avenue, approximately those parts of Brighton Park northwest of 38th Street and St. Louis Avenue or southwest of 43rd Street and Kedzie, and nearly 1/8 m² in the southwest corner of Austin. |
January 3, 2003 – January 3, 2005 |
See map and geography above. For a more detailed map, see the Census Bureau map linked below. | |||
Dan Lipinski | Democratic | January 3, 2005 – January 3, 2013 |
Incumbent | |
January 3, 2013 – present |
Read more about this topic: Illinois's 3rd Congressional District
Famous quotes containing the words list of and/or list:
“Sheathey call him Scholar Jack
Went down the list of the dead.
Officers, seamen, gunners, marines,
The crews of the gig and yawl,
The bearded man and the lad in his teens,
Carpenters, coal-passersall.”
—Joseph I. C. Clarke (18461925)
“The advice of their elders to young men is very apt to be as unreal as a list of the hundred best books.”
—Oliver Wendell Holmes, Jr. (18411935)